NIRMAL KUMAR
Nirmal Kumar is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Nirmal Kumar is 08707519.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Finance etc.
Following are the directorship details of Nirmal Kumar
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAI NEER NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 21 February 2020 | 31 October 2022 | Buy financial reports |
PALAKNEER NIDHI LIMITED | Finance | 2020 | Active | Director | 18 December 2020 | 12 April 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Nirmal Kumar are Subhash Chand, Bittu Choudhary.
FAQ - Nirmal Kumar
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Nirmal Kumar serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Nirmal Kumar?
The DIN of Nirmal Kumar is 08707519.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Nirmal Kumar?
The longest directorship of Nirmal Kumar is with SAI NEER NIDHI LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More