ANVITA HANS
Anvita Hans is registered with the Ministry of Corporate Affairs as a Director in Indian Companies. The DIN (Director Identification Number) of Anvita Hans is 00913895.
Currently, he/she serves as a director in 2 Companies in India. The companies he/she is associated with are from various industries such as Trading, Hotels and Restaurants etc.
Following are the directorship details of Anvita Hans
NAME | INDUSTRY | INCORP. YEAR | COMP. STATUS | DESIGNATION | DATE OF APPOINTMENT | AS ON | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AAROHEE ATTIRES PRIVATE LIMITED | Trading | 2015 | Active | Director | 16 June 2015 | 17 January 2023 | Buy financial reports |
UNITED HATCHERY PRIVATE LIMITED | Hotels and Restaurants | 1988 | Amalgamated | Director | 28 March 2008 | 12 September 2023 | Buy financial reports |
Other individuals who might be associated with Anvita Hans are Ajit Hans, Palak Hans Sen.
FAQ - Anvita Hans
-
How many companies is he/she appointed as director?
Anvita Hans serves as a director in 2 Companies in India.
-
What is the DIN of Anvita Hans?
The DIN of Anvita Hans is 00913895.
-
Which is the longest holding directorship of Anvita Hans?
The longest directorship of Anvita Hans is with UNITED HATCHERY PRIVATE LIMITED.
*Industry classification is inferred. If the company has changed line of business without intimating the Registrar or is a diversified business, classification may be different. We make no warranties about accuracy of industry classification
Tofler, TWS Systems Private Limited and its officers respect the Intellectual Property Rights of all people. Tofler makes no claim of ownership or affiliation with any trademark (REGISTERED OR UNREGISTERED) that forms part of any Company/LLP name listed on this page. Trademarks, if any, listed on this page belong to their respective owners. Read More